NJ S3465 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.130.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.130.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Revises requirements for examination and license to practice mortuary science.
Title
Revises requirements for examination and license to practice mortuary science.
Sponsors
Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Thomas Kean [R] | Sen. Jon Bramnick [R] | Rep. Angelica Jimenez [D] |
Rep. Linda Carter [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4914 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4914 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-21 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.130. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0) |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (38-0) |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-0) |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Substituted for A4914 (1R) |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4914 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S3465