NJ S3491 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Approved P.L.2021, c.152.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Approved P.L.2021, c.152.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Revises and expands authorization for any person or entity to obtain, distribute, and administer opioid antidotes.
Title
Revises and expands authorization for any person or entity to obtain, distribute, and administer opioid antidotes.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] | Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] |
Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5457 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Senate Substitute (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5457 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Senate Substitute (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.152. |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-0-0) |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Substituted for A5457 (ACS/1R) |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-3) |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Senate Substitution (28-0) (Vitale) |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5457 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Substituted by S3491 (SS)