NJ S381 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S108
Note: Carry Over of previous A1022
Note: Carry Over of previous A1022
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Approved P.L.2021, c.233.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Approved P.L.2021, c.233.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes supervised community reintegration program for certain victims of domestic violence.
Title
Establishes supervised community reintegration program for certain victims of domestic violence.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A720 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-21 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A720 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-21 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-28 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.233. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Substituted for A720 (3R) |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-09-14 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S108 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A720 (Same As) 2021-06-03 - Substituted by S381 (4R)
A1022 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
A720 (Same As) 2021-06-03 - Substituted by S381 (4R)
A1022 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee