NJ S3900 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-27 - Substituted by A5527 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-27 - Substituted by A5527 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain long-term care facilities to submit outbreak response plan to DOH.
Title
Requires certain long-term care facilities to submit outbreak response plan to DOH.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Richard Codey [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | Senate | Substituted by A5527 (2R) |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5527 (Same As) 2019-08-15 - Approved P.L.2019, c.243.