NJ S404 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S275
Note: Carry Foward to future A4149
Note: Carry Over of previous S845
Note: Carry Over of previous A1712
Note: Carry Foward to future A4149
Note: Carry Over of previous S845
Note: Carry Over of previous A1712
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits pharmacists to furnish self-administered hormonal contraceptives pursuant to a standing order, in accordance with protocols established by Board of Pharmacy and Board of Medical Examiners.
Title
Permits pharmacists to furnish self-administered hormonal contraceptives pursuant to a standing order, in accordance with protocols established by Board of Pharmacy and Board of Medical Examiners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (30-6) |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S404 (Carry Over) 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
S404 (Carry Over) 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
S845 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A5810 (Same As) 2021-06-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A1712 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
S404 (Carry Over) 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
S845 (Carry Over) 2019-05-13 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A5810 (Same As) 2021-06-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A1712 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee