NJ S4272 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1537
Note: Carry Foward to future S2217
Note: Carry Foward to future S2217
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends economic recovery term under "Municipal Rehabilitation and Economic Recovery Act; bars appeal of certain property assessments.*
Title
Extends economic recovery term under "Municipal Rehabilitation and Economic Recovery Act; bars appeal of certain property assessments.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (29-7) |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2019-12-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4272 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
S4272 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
A5958 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S4272 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
A5958 (Same As) 2020-01-09 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading