NJ S49 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by A5499
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-27 - Substituted by A5499 (ACS/2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-27 - Substituted by A5499 (ACS/2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes DOBI to establish State-based exchange for certain health insurance plans; requires DHS to apply for federal funds for integration of Medicaid eligibility platform and exchange.**
Title
Authorizes DOBI to establish State-based exchange for certain health insurance plans; requires DHS to apply for federal funds for integration of Medicaid eligibility platform and exchange.**
Sponsors
Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Nia Gill [D] | Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | Senate | Substituted by A5499 (ACS/2R) |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Senate Amendment (25-1) (Pou) |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5499 (Same As) 2019-06-28 - Approved P.L.2019, c.141.
A5499 (Replaced by) 2019-06-28 - Approved P.L.2019, c.141.
A5499 (Replaced by) 2019-06-28 - Approved P.L.2019, c.141.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/S49 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/S0500/49_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S49 |