NJ S616 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2149
Note: Carry Over of previous A3866
Note: Carry Over of previous A3866
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Pending: Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Lowers age of eligibility for surviving spouse under homestead property tax reimbursement program.
Title
Lowers age of eligibility for surviving spouse under homestead property tax reimbursement program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2149 (Carry Over) 2022-10-27 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3866 (Carry Over) 2022-05-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee
A3463 (Same As) 2024-02-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Human Services Committee
A3866 (Carry Over) 2022-05-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee
A3463 (Same As) 2024-02-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Human Services Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S616 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S1000/616_I1.HTM |