NJ S876 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3501
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-23 - Approved P.L.2019, c.196.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-23 - Approved P.L.2019, c.196.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Revises process for development and administration of Transportation Trust Fund projects and capital program oversight; establishes transportation research center.
Title
Revises process for development and administration of Transportation Trust Fund projects and capital program oversight; establishes transportation research center.
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] | Sen. Steven Oroho [R] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] |
Sen. Anthony M. Bucco [R] | Rep. Harold Wirths [R] | Sen. Parker Space [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2607 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2607 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-23 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.196. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Substituted for A2607 (2R) |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (34-0) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Senate Amendment (36-0) (Sweeney) |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Senate Amendment (34-0) (Sweeney) |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3501 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A2607 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S876 (3R)
A2607 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S876 (3R)