NJ A2607 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3501
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S876 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S876 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Revises process for development and administration of Transportation Trust Fund projects and capital program oversight; establishes transportation research center.
Title
Revises process for development and administration of Transportation Trust Fund projects and capital program oversight; establishes transportation research center.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Substituted by S876 (3R) |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S876 (Same As) 2019-07-23 - Approved P.L.2019, c.196.
S3501 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S3501 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee