NJ SCR180 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on January 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-11 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on January 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-11 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Determines that DEP's proposal to revise Flood Hazard Area Control Act Rules, Coastal Zone Management Rules, and Stormwater Management Rules is inconsistent with legislative intent.
Title
Determines that DEP's proposal to revise Flood Hazard Area Control Act Rules, Coastal Zone Management Rules, and Stormwater Management Rules is inconsistent with legislative intent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For Acr249 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 28 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-19 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 28 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-11-16 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-19 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Filed with Secretary of State |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (45-28-2) |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Substituted for ACR249 |
2015-11-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-11-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
2015-10-22 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (24-13) |
2015-10-19 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-10-19 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
ACR249 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by SCR180
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2014/SCR180 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2014/SCR/180_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SCR180 |