NJ SJR84 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-26 - Approved P.L.2018, JR-14.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Commemorates 50th anniversary of Fair Housing Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commemorates 50th anniversary of Fair Housing Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for AJR136 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-26AssemblyApproved P.L.2018, JR-14.
2018-12-17AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-2)
2018-12-17AssemblySubstituted for AJR136
2018-09-13AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-07-30AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
2018-07-26SenatePassed by the Senate (30-0)
2018-06-25SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-06-11SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

AJR136 (Same As) 2018-12-17 - Substituted by SJR84

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback