NM HB138 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-19 - [LD 34] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 136
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-19 - [LD 34] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 136
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Lactation Consultant Practice Act
Title
Lactation Consultant Practice Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-19 | House | [LD 34] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 136 |
2017-02-19 | Senate | [LD 34] Passed Senate (22-15) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | [LD 31] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-12 | Senate | [LD 27] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-02-12 | Senate | [LD 27] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-09 | Senate | [LD 24] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2017-02-09 | Senate | [LD 24] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] Passed House (39-26) |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] Floor amendment adopted |
2017-01-25 | House | [LD 9] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-25 | House | [LD 9] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-20 | House | [LD 4] HSIVC |
2017-01-20 | House | [LD 4] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-20 | House | [LD 4] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-17 | House | [LD 1] HHouse Health |
2017-01-17 | House | [LD 1] HHouse Health and then to HSIVC |