NM HB196 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-16 - [LD 23] Failed passage in House (33-36).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-16 - [LD 23] Failed passage in House (33-36).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempt some online services from procurement
Title
Exempt some online services from procurement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-16 | [LD 23] Failed passage in House (33-36). | |
2012-02-15 | [LD 22] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-08 | [LD 17] Referred to House Business & Industry | |
2012-02-08 | [LD 17] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Referred to House Labor & Human Resources | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-24 | [LD 6] Referred to House Transportation & Public Works | |
2012-01-24 | [LD 6] Assigned to House Transportation & Public Works and then to House Labor & Human Resources and then to House Business & Industry |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=H&legtype=B&legno=196&year=12 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/12%20Regular/bills/house/HB0196.pdf |