NM HB302 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-19 - [LD 34] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 54
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-19 - [LD 34] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 54
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Redefining "autocycle"
Title
Redefining "autocycle"
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-19 | House | [LD 34] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 54 |
2017-02-19 | Senate | [LD 34] Passed Senate (39-0) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | [LD 32] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-13 | Senate | [LD 28] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-02-13 | Senate | [LD 28] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Passed House (61-0) |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-23 | House | [LD 7] Referred to House Judiciary |
2017-01-23 | House | [LD 7] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-20 | House | [LD 4] Referred to House Consumer & Public Affairs |
2017-01-20 | House | [LD 4] Assigned to House Consumer & Public Affairs and then to House Judiciary |