NM HB36 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-16 - [LD 31] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-16 - [LD 31] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Law Enforcement Family License Plates
Title
Law Enforcement Family License Plates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-16 | Senate | [LD 31] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-16 | Senate | [LD 31] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-07 | Senate | [LD 22] Referred to Senate Finance |
2017-02-07 | Senate | [LD 22] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-24 | Senate | [LD 8] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2017-01-24 | Senate | [LD 8] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance |
2017-01-20 | House | [LD 4] Passed House (57-0) |
2017-01-20 | House | [LD 4] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-19 | House | [LD 3] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue |
2017-01-19 | House | [LD 3] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-17 | House | [LD 1] Referred to House Transportation & Public Works |
2017-01-17 | House | [LD 1] Assigned to House Transportation & Public Works and then to House Taxation & Revenue |
2017-01-17 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |