NM HB479 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-09 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 274 - Apr. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

De-earmark Local Option Gross Receipts

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

De-earmark Local Option Gross Receipts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-09HouseSigned by Governor - Chapter 274 - Apr. 4
2019-03-09SenatePassed in the Senate - Y:37 N:4
2019-03-09SenateSFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-03-02SenateSCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-02-25SenateSent to SCORC - Referrals: SCORC/SFC
2019-02-22HousePassed in the House of Representatives - Y:64 N:0
2019-02-20HouseHTRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
2019-02-14HouseHLLC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
2019-02-05HouseSent to HLLC - Referrals: HLLC/HTRC

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback