NM HB558 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 204 - Apr. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 204 - Apr. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Gila Cancer Center Revenue Bonds
Title
Gila Cancer Center Revenue Bonds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 204 - Apr. 3 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:34 N:0 |
2019-03-10 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Sent to SFC - Referrals: SFC |
2019-03-05 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:59 N:0 |
2019-03-04 | House | Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2019-02-28 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-13 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC/HAFC |