NM HB67 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-10 - [LD 19] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-10 - [LD 19] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
National background check for concealed guns
Title
National background check for concealed guns
Sponsors
Rep. Jimmie Hall [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-10 | [LD 19] Action postponed indefinitely | |
2012-02-10 | [LD 19] Referred to House Judiciary | |
2012-02-10 | [LD 19] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Referred to House Consumer & Public Affairs | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Assigned to House Consumer & Public Affairs and then to House Judiciary | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Printed | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Not Printed | |
2012-01-17 | [LD 1] House Pre-file |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=H&legtype=B&legno=67&year=12 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/12%20Regular/bills/house/HB0067.pdf |