NM SB120 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 90 - Mar. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 90 - Mar. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Real Estate Auctioneer Licensure & Fees
Title
Real Estate Auctioneer Licensure & Fees
Sponsors
Sen. Pat Woods [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 90 - Mar. 28 |
2019-03-13 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:64 N:0 |
2019-03-10 | House | HSEIC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-05 | House | HCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-22 | House | Sent to HCEDC - Referrals: HCEDC/HSEIC |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:39 N:0 |
2019-02-19 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-07 | Senate | SCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Sent to SCORC - Referrals: SCORC/SJC |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |