NM SB184 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Signed by one or both houses (Mar.14) Ch. 15.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-15 - [LD 44] Signed by one or both houses (Mar.14) Ch. 15.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Plant protection act changes
Title
Plant protection act changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-11 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Signed by one or both houses (Mar.14) Ch. 15. |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Passed House (60-0) |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-05 | House | [LD 36] Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-03-05 | House | [LD 36] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-21 | House | [LD 28] Referred to House Agriculture & Water Resources |
2013-02-21 | House | [LD 28] Assigned to House Agriculture & Water Resources and then to House Judiciary |
2013-02-07 | Senate | [LD 18] Passed Senate (39-0) |
2013-02-07 | Senate | [LD 18] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2013-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-16 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2013-01-16 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Conservation and then to Senate Judiciary |