NM SB237 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-06 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-06 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limitation On Surveying Actions
Title
Limitation On Surveying Actions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | House | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2019-03-06 | House | Sent to HSEIC - Referrals: HSEIC |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:30 N:7 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2019-02-11 | Senate | SCORC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Sent to SCORC - Referrals: SCORC/SJC |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Sent to SPREF - Referrals: SPREF |