NM SB330 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-13 - [LD 55] PASSED/H (63-0) SGND (Apr.8) Ch.166.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-13 - [LD 55] PASSED/H (63-0) SGND (Apr.8) Ch.166.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Family, infant, toddler program enrollment
Title
Family, infant, toddler program enrollment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-13 | [LD 55] PASSED/H (63-0) SGND (Apr.8) Ch.166. | |
2011-03-10 | [LD 52] HHGAC/HEC-HHGAC- w/drn all committees | |
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] PASSED/S (31-0) | |
2011-02-26 | [LD 40] DP/a | |
2011-02-11 | [LD 25] w/drn - ref SFC-SFC | |
2011-02-08 | [LD 22] DP/a-SPAC | |
2011-01-19 | [LD 2] SEC/SPAC-SEC |