NM SB386 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Pocket Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Pocket Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
La Marcha De Los Novios As State Dance
Title
La Marcha De Los Novios As State Dance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-03-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | Senate | Pocket Veto |
2019-03-12 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:53 N:0 |
2019-03-08 | House | HLLC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-04 | House | Sent to HLLC - Referrals: HLLC |
2019-03-02 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:37 N:0 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-05 | Senate | SIAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Sent to SIAC - Referrals: SIAC/SPAC |