NM SB535 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 273 - Apr. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 273 - Apr. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Certain Bonding Fund Money To Permanent Fund
Title
Certain Bonding Fund Money To Permanent Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 273 - Apr. 4 |
2019-03-11 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:62 N:0 |
2019-03-10 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-03-07 | House | HTRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2019-02-19 | House | Sent to HTRC - Referrals: HTRC/HAFC |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:37 N:0 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment |
2019-02-15 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Sent to SFC - Referrals: SFC |