NM SB88 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-29 - [LD 13] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 76
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-29 - [LD 13] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 76
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public Insurance Adjusters
Title
Public Insurance Adjusters
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-17 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-29 | Senate | [LD 13] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 76 |
2017-01-29 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (58-0) |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Referred to House Judiciary |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-23 | House | [LD 7] Referred to House Business & Industry |
2017-01-23 | House | [LD 7] Assigned to House Business & Industry and then to House Judiciary |
2017-02-02 | Senate | [LD 17] Passed Senate (39-0) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | [LD 15] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-31 | Senate | [LD 15] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-23 | Senate | [LD 7] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-01-23 | Senate | [LD 7] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-17 | Senate | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2017-01-17 | Senate | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Judiciary |
2017-01-17 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |