NM SB94 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 55] Passed House (63-0) Signed by one or both houses (Apr.3) Ch.136.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 55] Passed House (63-0) Signed by one or both houses (Apr.3) Ch.136.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Penalties for no boat floatation devices
Title
Penalties for no boat floatation devices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-16 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 55] Passed House (63-0) Signed by one or both houses (Apr.3) Ch.136. |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 52] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 52] Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 52] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-05 | House | [LD 36] Referred to House Consumer & Public Affairs |
2013-03-05 | House | [LD 36] Assigned to House Consumer & Public Affairs and then to House Judiciary |
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Passed Senate (37-0) |
2013-02-15 | Senate | [LD 24] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-08 | Senate | [LD 19] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2013-02-08 | Senate | [LD 19] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-08 | Senate | [LD 19] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-15 | Senate | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2013-01-15 | Senate | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Conservation and then to Senate Judiciary |