NM SJM13 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-13 - [LD 55] DP API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-13 - [LD 55] DP API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting outdoor opportunities for children
Title
Supporting outdoor opportunities for children
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-13 | [LD 55] DP API. | |
2011-03-10 | [LD 52] HCPAC | |
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] PASSED/S (31-0) | |
2011-02-11 | [LD 25] DP | |
2011-02-08 | [LD 22] DP-SEC | |
2011-01-19 | [LD 2] SRC/SEC-SRC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=S&legtype=JM&legno=13&year=11 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/11%20Regular/memorials/senate/SJM013.pdf |