NM SM13 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Reconvene J. Paul Taylor Task Force
Title
Reconvene J. Paul Taylor Task Force
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | House | Signed by one or both houses (for legislation not requiring Governor's signature) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:39 N:0 |
2021-03-14 | Senate | SHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-13 | Senate | SRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SHPAC |