NM SM51 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Passed in the Senate - Y:40 N:0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Passed in the Senate - Y:40 N:0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Federal Radiation Exposure Compensation
Title
Federal Radiation Exposure Compensation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:40 N:0 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | SCONC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-02-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Sent to SRC - Referrals: SRC/SCONC |