NV AB1 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to taxation; authorizing certain counties to impose an additional local sales and use tax to fund the operation of a system of solid waste management; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Authorizes certain counties to impose additional local sales and use tax under certain circumstances. (BDR 32-306)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-06 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2023-04-14 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee. |
2023-04-14 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2023-04-14 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2023-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-02-21 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2023-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To committee. |
2022-12-01 | Assembly | From printer. |
2022-11-16 | Assembly | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Revenue. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/App/NELIS/REL/82nd2023/Bill/9506/Overview |
Text | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/82nd2023/Bills/AB/AB1.pdf |