NV AB285 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-15 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-15 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to the repair of certain roads. (BDR 18-704)
Title
Revises provisions relating to the repair of certain roads. (BDR 18-704)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-15 | Assembly | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.) |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2017-03-15 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2017-03-14 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Reports/history.cfm?ID=621 |
Text | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/79th2017/Bills/AB/AB285.pdf |