NV AB345 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Chapter 619.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to elections; authorizing each county and city clerk to establish polling places where any registered voter of the county or city, respectively, may vote in person on the day of certain elections; authorizing an elector to register to vote during certain periods before and on the day of certain elections and setting forth the requirements for such registration; requiring the Secretary of State to establish a system for voter registration on the Internet website of the Secretary of State and setting forth certain requirements for that system; requiring the Department of Motor Vehicles to provide a form to decline voter registration or indicate a political party affiliation after concluding certain transactions with the Department; requiring a county clerk to reject certain applications to register to vote that are automatically transmitted to the county clerk by the Department of Motor Vehicles; revising requirements to publish certain information relating to elections in a newspaper; revising certain provisions relating to a student trainee serving as election board officer; requiring a provisional ballot to include all offices, candidates and measures upon which the person casting the provisional ballot would be entitled to vote if he or she were casting a regular ballot; revising certain deadlines related to absent ballots; authorizing a registered voter to request an absentee ballot for all elections; revising certain other requirements for absent ballots; revising the hours for early voting; authorizing county and city clerks to extend the hours for early voting after the hours have been published; establishing certain protections for private property owners who rent private property for use as a polling place; establishing certain requirements for the database of the Department of Motor Vehicles relating to processing and verifying voter registration information; making appropriations; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes various changes relating to elections. (BDR 24-873)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17AssemblyChapter 619.
2019-06-14AssemblyApproved by the Governor.
2019-06-03AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-06-02AssemblySenate Amendment No. 1080 concurred in. To enrollment.
2019-06-02AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-06-02SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.) To Assembly.
2019-06-02SenatePlaced on General File.
2019-06-02SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended.
2019-06-02SenateTo committee.
2019-06-02SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint.
2019-06-01SenateRe-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.
2019-06-01SenateRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1080.)
2019-05-31SenateRead second time.
2019-05-31SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-05-31SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-05-28SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
2019-05-28SenateIn Senate.
2019-05-28AssemblyTo Senate.
2019-05-28AssemblyFrom printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
2019-05-28AssemblyTo printer.
2019-05-28AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 12, Excused: 1, Vacant: 1.)
2019-05-28AssemblyDispensed with reprinting.
2019-05-28AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 929.)
2019-05-28AssemblyPlaced on General File.
2019-05-28AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee.
2019-04-23AssemblyRead third time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 532 and 583.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.
2019-04-23AssemblyDeclared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-22AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2019-03-20AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-18AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback