NV AB354 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 484.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 484.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to the State Personnel System. (BDR 23-1014)
Title
Revises provisions relating to the State Personnel System. (BDR 23-1014)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 484. | |
2011-06-16 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2011-06-06 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2011-06-06 | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly. | |
2011-06-06 | From committee: Do pass. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2011-06-05 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee. | |
2011-06-05 | In Senate. | |
2011-06-05 | To Senate. | |
2011-06-05 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . | |
2011-06-04 | To printer. | |
2011-06-04 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 25, Nays: 13, Excused: 4.) | |
2011-06-04 | Dispensed with reprinting. | |
2011-06-04 | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 901.) | |
2011-06-04 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2011-06-04 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-04-18 | Exemption effective. | |
2011-04-18 | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. | |
2011-04-18 | From committee: Without recommendation, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means. | |
2011-04-06 | Notice of eligibility for exemption. | |
2011-03-23 | From printer. To committee. | |
2011-03-21 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |