NV AB391 | 2013 | 77th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to energy. (BDR 58-1025)
Title
Revises provisions relating to energy. (BDR 58-1025)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-07 | Assembly | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2013-06-01 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | To enrollment. |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | Senate Amendment Nos. 771 and 816 concurred in. |
2013-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 11, Nays: 10.) To Assembly. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint . |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 816.) To printer. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 771.) To printer. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | In Senate. |
2013-04-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 24, Nays: 14, Excused: 2, Not voting: 1, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2013-04-19 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 478.) To printer. |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2013-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2013-03-20 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2013-03-18 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |