NV AB416 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Vetoed by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing certain programs for renewable energy. (BDR 58-849)
Title
Revises provisions governing certain programs for renewable energy. (BDR 58-849)
Sponsors
Sen. Kelvin Atkinson [D] | Rep. David Bobzien [D] | Rep. Marcus Conklin [D] | Sen. Steven Horsford [D] |
Rep. Marilyn Kirkpatrick [D] | Sen. Sheila Leslie [D] | Sen. Marilyn Dondero Loop [D] | Sen. Michael Schneider [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2011-06-16 | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. | |
2011-06-08 | To enrollment. | |
2011-06-08 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint . | |
2011-06-06 | To printer. | |
2011-06-06 | Senate Amendment Nos. 975 and 989 concurred in. | |
2011-06-06 | In Assembly. | |
2011-06-06 | To Assembly. | |
2011-06-06 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 16, Nays: 5.) | |
2011-06-06 | Reprinting dispensed with. | |
2011-06-06 | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 975 and 989.) | |
2011-06-06 | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. | |
2011-06-06 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-06-05 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. | |
2011-06-05 | In Senate. | |
2011-06-05 | To Senate. | |
2011-06-05 | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint . | |
2011-06-05 | To printer. | |
2011-06-05 | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) | |
2011-06-05 | Dispensed with reprinting. | |
2011-06-05 | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 899.) | |
2011-06-05 | Placed on General File. | |
2011-06-05 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-04-26 | Exemption effective. | |
2011-04-26 | To committee. | |
2011-04-26 | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . | |
2011-04-25 | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 433.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer. | |
2011-04-25 | Placed on Second Reading File. | |
2011-04-25 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. | |
2011-04-11 | Notice of eligibility for exemption. | |
2011-03-23 | From printer. To committee. | |
2011-03-21 | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |