NV AB434 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Chapter 363.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Chapter 363.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to offenses; revising provisions relating to imprisonment or community service ordered for a convicted person; establishing various provisions relating to the commission of certain traffic offenses; revising provisions relating to the payment of administrative assessments, fines and court fees and the collection of delinquent assessments, fines and fees; requiring any fine paid or forfeiture of bail by a person who commits certain offenses to be credited to the State Permanent School Fund; revising provisions relating to speeding violations; providing a penalty; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises various provisions relating to offenses. (BDR 14-428)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-05 | Assembly | Chapter 363. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-06-01 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 772 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2019-05-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 3, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 772.) To printer. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 34, Nays: 6, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 400.) To printer. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |