NV AB439 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-05 - Chapter 322.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to juvenile justice; revising provisions relating to the imposition of certain fees, costs and administrative assessments in juvenile proceedings; enacting provisions relating to the cost of medical care incurred by a child in the custody of certain facilities for the detention of children; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to juvenile justice. (BDR 5-1093)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-05AssemblyChapter 322.
2019-06-03AssemblyApproved by the Governor.
2019-06-01AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-05-28AssemblySenate Amendment No. 773 concurred in. To enrollment.
2019-05-27AssemblyIn Assembly.
2019-05-24SenateRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.
2019-05-24SenateFrom printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
2019-05-23SenateRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 773.) To printer.
2019-05-23SenatePlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-05-23SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-24SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2019-04-24SenateIn Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: None, Excused: 2.) To Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-22AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 402.) To printer.
2019-04-22AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-22AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-04-22AssemblyNotice of eligibility for exemption.
2019-03-26AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-25AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback