NV AB482 | 2019 | 80th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 84.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT relating to governmental administration; revising provisions relating to an application for issuance or renewal of a certificate of permission to perform marriages or specific marriages; revising provisions governing certain crimes related to soliciting or influencing marriage on county property or performing marriages; authorizing each county clerk to charge and collect a fee for the filing and recording or issuing of certain documents; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises provisions relating to governmental administration. (BDR 11-1111)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16AssemblyApproved by the Governor. Chapter 84.
2019-05-10AssemblyEnrolled and delivered to Governor.
2019-05-09AssemblyIn Assembly. To enrollment.
2019-05-08SenateRead third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly.
2019-05-07SenateRead second time.
2019-05-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass.
2019-04-24SenateRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.
2019-04-24SenateIn Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 35, Nays: 6, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
2019-04-23AssemblyFrom printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
2019-04-22AssemblyRead second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 312.) To printer.
2019-04-22AssemblyPlaced on Second Reading File.
2019-04-22AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
2019-03-26AssemblyFrom printer. To committee.
2019-03-25AssemblyRead first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nevada State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback