NV SB384 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Vetoed by the Governor. (Return to 83rd Session)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Vetoed by the Governor. (Return to 83rd Session)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to broadband; establishing certain requirements for a state agency that awards grants of federal money for the development of broadband services and infrastructure; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Establishes certain provisions relating to the award of grants of federal money by a state agency for the development of broadband services and infrastructure. (BDR 18-1035)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-16 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. (Return to 83rd Session) |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 593 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 26, Nays: 14, Excused: 2.) To Senate. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 593.) To printer. |
2023-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Growth and Infrastructure. To committee. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.) To Assembly. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 476.) To printer. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |