NV SB388 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-06 - (No further action taken.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to public employees; authorizing certain collective bargaining agreements entered into by the Executive Department of the State Government to contain certain provisions relating to the payment of contributions to the Public Employees' Retirement System; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to certain public employees. (BDR 23-131)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-06 | Assembly | (No further action taken.) |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To committee. |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2023-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee. |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.) To Assembly. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 467.) To printer. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer. |