NV SB469 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Chapter 563.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Chapter 563.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to education; clarifying that a large school district is responsible for utilities for each local school precinct; revising the number of local school precincts in a large school district that a school associate superintendent is authorized to oversee; revising provisions relating to the allocation of money by such a large school district to local school precincts to carry out the responsibilities transferred to the precincts; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to the reorganization of certain school districts. (BDR 34-818)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | Senate | Chapter 563. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 859 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 2, Vacant: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 859.) To printer. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.) To Assembly. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 546.) To printer. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2019-04-16 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 281.) To printer. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer. |