NY A00048 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.3
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.3
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to limitations on the use of smart access systems; restricts information that may be gathered on lessees, tenants, owners or guests.
Title
Relates to limitations on the use of smart access systems; restricts information that may be gathered on lessees, tenants, owners or guests.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.3 |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.567 |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | rules report cal.567 |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | reported |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | print number 48b |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2023-05-16 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2023-05-12 | Assembly | print number 48a |
2023-05-12 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to housing |
2023-01-04 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S02078 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT