NY A00261 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-4)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.210
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Directs the commissioner of the office for people with developmental disabilities, the commissioner of education, the commissioner of health, the commissioner of the office of children and family services and the commissioner of mental health to study and report the costs to the state for the early diagnosis of autism spectrum disorder and the long-term treatment for individuals with autism spectrum disorder.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directs the commissioner of the office for people with developmental disabilities, the commissioner of education, the commissioner of health, the commissioner of the office of children and family services and the commissioner of mental health to study and report the costs to the state for the early diagnosis of autism spectrum disorder and the long-term treatment for individuals with autism spectrum disorder.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24Senatesigned chap.210
2018-08-13Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-07SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-07SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-07Senate3RD READING CAL.1639
2018-06-07SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S3895
2018-01-09SenateREFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES
2018-01-09Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-01-09Assemblypassed assembly
2018-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.18
2018-01-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-01-03SenateDIED IN SENATE
2017-06-05SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2017-06-05Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-06-05Assemblypassed assembly
2017-05-25Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.479
2017-05-23Assemblyreported
2017-01-31Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2017-01-05Assemblyreferred to mental health

Same As/Similar To

S03895 (Same As) 2018-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A261

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00261&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00261&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00261
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00261&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00261&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00261&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A261#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback