NY A00277 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-31 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-31 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "Crohn's and colitis fairness act"; provides restroom access to persons with certain medical conditions; defines the term eligible medical condition.
Title
Enacts the "Crohn's and colitis fairness act"; provides restroom access to persons with certain medical conditions; defines the term eligible medical condition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2016-03-31 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-03-31 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.19 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-01-06 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2015-06-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.44 |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.44 |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-02-10 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2015-01-07 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S04918 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES