NY A00368 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - signed chap.9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-15 - signed chap.9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs that the New York state office of general services statewide administrative services contract be used to select qualified interpreters to be used for translation services for inmates appearing before the parole board.
Title
Directs that the New York state office of general services statewide administrative services contract be used to select qualified interpreters to be used for translation services for inmates appearing before the parole board.
Sponsors
Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] | Asm. Felix Ortiz [D] | Asm. Nick Perry [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] |
Asm. David Weprin [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | Senate | signed chap.9 |
2017-03-03 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-02-06 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-02-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-02-06 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.4 |
2017-02-06 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S971 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-01-31 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-01-31 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-01-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.14 |
2017-01-24 | Assembly | reported |
2017-01-05 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S00971 (Same As) 2017-02-06 - SUBSTITUTED BY A368