NY A00379 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - referred to labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-04 - referred to labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Excludes certain seasonal fair workers from the definition of employee for purposes of the minimum wage act.
Title
Excludes certain seasonal fair workers from the definition of employee for purposes of the minimum wage act.
Sponsors
Asm. William Magee [D] | Asm. Tony Jordan [R] | Asm. Steven McLaughlin [R] | Asm. Teresa Sayward [R] |
Asm. Clifford Crouch [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2011-05-12 | Assembly | print number 379b |
2011-05-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to labor |
2011-03-07 | Assembly | print number 379a |
2011-03-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to labor |
2011-01-05 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S02399 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES