NY S02399 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Excludes certain seasonal fair workers from the definition of employee for purposes of the minimum wage act.
Title
Excludes certain seasonal fair workers from the definition of employee for purposes of the minimum wage act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-06-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-06-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-06-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1072 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2011-06-24 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-05-10 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 2399B |
2011-05-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-05-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-04-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.396 |
2011-02-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2399A |
2011-02-03 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LABOR |
2011-01-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A00379 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - referred to labor