NY A00533 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - substituted by s1795
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - substituted by s1795
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the establishment of a program for the use of medication assisted treatment for inmates in both state and county correctional facilities; relates to reporting requirements; substance use disorder treatment and transition services implemented in jails.
Title
Relates to the establishment of a program for the use of medication assisted treatment for inmates in both state and county correctional facilities; relates to reporting requirements; substance use disorder treatment and transition services implemented in jails.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | Assembly | substituted by s1795 |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.341 |
2021-05-11 | Assembly | reported |
2021-04-27 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-01-06 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S01795 (Same As) 2021-10-07 - APPROVAL MEMO.22