NY A00590 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the problem gambling advisory council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the problem gambling advisory council.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Alcoholism And Drug Abuse Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2019-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.618
2019-06-19Assemblyrules report cal.618
2019-06-19Assemblyreported
2019-06-19Assemblyreported referred to rules
2019-06-05Assemblyprint number 590a
2019-06-05Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2019-01-23Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2019-01-09Assemblyreferred to alcoholism and drug abuse

Same As/Similar To

S03103 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00590&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00590&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00590
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00590&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A00590A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00590&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00590&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00590&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A00590&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback